TN SB1404 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, states that a parent not in possession of a child is entitled to video chat with the child as part of the right to unimpeded telephone conversations if the technology is available to both the parent and the child; states that a parent is not required to purchase any device in order to allow the other parent to video chat with the child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, states that a parent not in possession of a child is entitled to video chat with the child as part of the right to unimpeded telephone conversations if the technology is available to both the parent and the child; states that a parent is not required to purchase any device in order to allow the other parent to video chat with the child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0102) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1426 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee