TN SB1389 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the development and use of a commemorative certificate of nonviable birth. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the development and use of a commemorative certificate of nonviable birth. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Pub. Ch. 156 | |
2019-04-24 | Effective date(s) 04/18/2019 | |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 5, PNV 3 |
2019-04-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0186) |
2019-04-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0185) |
2019-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0108) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0966 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 156