TN SB1387 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the Tennessee Task Force on Lupus Education and Awareness. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 50; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates the Tennessee Task Force on Lupus Education and Awareness. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 50; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 984
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-24SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1271)
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-23HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1271)
2018-04-23HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0366)
2018-04-23HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-04-13HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-10SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2017-04-10SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0277)
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017
2017-04-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1307 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 984

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback