TN HB1307 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Tennessee Task Force on Lupus Education and Awareness. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 50; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, creates the Tennessee Task Force on Lupus Education and Awareness. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 50; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 984 | |
2018-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Study Subcommittee |
2017-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1387 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 984