TN SB1381 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any municipality proposing to annex territory within the municipality's urban growth boundary to mail notice to any property owners within that urban growth boundary 90 days prior to the date of proposed annexation and to hold at least three public, informational meetings. - Amends TCA Title 6.
Title
As introduced, requires any municipality proposing to annex territory within the municipality's urban growth boundary to mail notice to any property owners within that urban growth boundary 90 days prior to the date of proposed annexation and to hold at least three public, informational meetings. - Amends TCA Title 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1319 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-20 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1381&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1381.pdf |