TN SB1377 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes LEAs to purchase technology using state school funds for textbooks and instructional materials in a school year immediately following a textbook adoption cycle in which the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission did not list or recommend career and technical education textbooks or instructional materials; authorizes LEAs to use any remainder of such funds after the purchase of career and technical education textbooks or instructional materials to purchase technology. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05 Pub. Ch. 276
2021-05-05 Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
2021-04-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-21SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-19HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0261)
2021-04-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-19HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-15SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-04-15SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0234)
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0795 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 276

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback