TN HB0795 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes LEAs to purchase technology using state school funds for textbooks and instructional materials in a school year immediately following a textbook adoption cycle in which the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission did not list or recommend career and technical education textbooks or instructional materials; authorizes LEAs to use any remainder of such funds after the purchase of career and technical education textbooks or instructional materials to purchase technology. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 276
2021-04-19HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-17HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
2021-03-17HouseRef. to Education Instruction
2021-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1377 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback