TN SB1377 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, bars a member of a decertified county political party from being allowed membership into a newly formed county political party until two years have passed from the time of decertification, unless the member provides good cause for membership and the chair of the state executive committee approves. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, bars a member of a decertified county political party from being allowed membership into a newly formed county political party until two years have passed from the time of decertification, unless the member provides good cause for membership and the chair of the state executive committee approves. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1351 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee