TN SB1350 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a county to impose a litigation tax on all civil and criminal cases in the sessions, juvenile, and municipal courts; requires the funds to be used exclusively to support substance abuse prevention coalitions operating within the county. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-601.
Title
As introduced, permits a county to impose a litigation tax on all civil and criminal cases in the sessions, juvenile, and municipal courts; requires the funds to be used exclusively to support substance abuse prevention coalitions operating within the county. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-601.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1354 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.