TN SB1341 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes Shelby County to appropriate funds for affordable housing or workforce housing. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 71, relative to affordable housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1472 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Sponsor change.