TN SB1341 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the open container law to include the driver of a motor vehicle as well as the passengers; permits certain bowling centers to serve alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption if the bowling center has a restaurant or limited service restaurant located on the premises of the bowling center. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, expands the open container law to include the driver of a motor vehicle as well as the passengers; permits certain bowling centers to serve alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption if the bowling center has a restaurant or limited service restaurant located on the premises of the bowling center. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0140 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Failed in State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1341&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1341.pdf |