TN SB1336 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to second calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to second calendar of 2022
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes antiquated language that required the comptroller's office to study the formation and operation of community schools and report its finding by November 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to second calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1516 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-02 - Failed in Education Instruction