TN SB1322 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an advisory council that shall study the potential impact of tort reform measures on anticompetitive activities engaged in by hospitals, insurance companies and health care professionals and whether or not such impact, if any, would increase or decrease the overall cost of healthcare in this state. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 24; Title 25 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, creates an advisory council that shall study the potential impact of tort reform measures on anticompetitive activities engaged in by hospitals, insurance companies and health care professionals and whether or not such impact, if any, would increase or decrease the overall cost of healthcare in this state. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 24; Title 25 and Title 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1848 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1322&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1322.pdf |