TN SB1318 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the education administration committee of the house must approve the expenditures made from the proceeds of property sold by the board of regents. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1216 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.