TN SB1315 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Election Integrity Act," which requires that absentee ballots, other than ballots authorized by state or federal law to be delivered electronically to qualified voters who are entitled to vote by absentee ballot, include a watermark approved by the coordinator of elections; requires a counting board official to verify that the absentee ballots contain the watermark and reject any ballot that does not bear the watermark. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16 and Title 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16 and Title 17, relative to the "Tennessee Election Integrity Act".
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2022 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 374 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0321) |
2021-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0286) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1276 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374