TN HB1276 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Election Integrity Act," which requires that absentee ballots, other than ballots authorized by state or federal law to be delivered electronically to qualified voters who are entitled to vote by absentee ballot, include a watermark approved by the coordinator of elections; requires a counting board official to verify that the absentee ballots contain the watermark and reject any ballot that does not bear the watermark. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16 and Title 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 16 and Title 17, relative to the "Tennessee Election Integrity Act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1315 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022