TN SB1314 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a healthcare prescriber from issuing a prescription for a dual-purpose prescription medication for diabetes to a person in this state if the person does not have a diagnosis of diabetes; defines a dual-purpose prescription medication for diabetes as a prescription drug that has a listed indication for diabetes and may also be used for purposes of weight loss in persons who do not have a diagnosis of diabetes. - Amends TCA Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to medications intended for persons with diabetes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1419 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback