TN SB1313 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the date, from January 1, 2020, to February 1, 2020, before which the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations must submit a report on its study of global positioning monitoring as a condition of bail to the speakers and chairs of the judiciary committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Chapter 827 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Title
As enacted, extends the date, from January 1, 2020, to February 1, 2020, before which the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations must submit a report on its study of global positioning monitoring as a condition of bail to the speakers and chairs of the judiciary committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-111; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Chapter 827 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 208 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1479 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 208