TN SB1300 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a new division of state government, the Tennessee Office of Cooperative Disability Investigation, to operate for two years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 10; Title 38 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, creates a new division of state government, the Tennessee Office of Cooperative Disability Investigation, to operate for two years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 10; Title 38 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1172 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee