TN SB1274 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows professionals who own corporations, limited partnerships, and similar business entities to take their professional privilege tax payment as a credit against the business entity's franchise and excise tax liability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As introduced, allows professionals who own corporations, limited partnerships, and similar business entities to take their professional privilege tax payment as a credit against the business entity's franchise and excise tax liability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1042 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee