TN SB1273 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, replaces an obsolete reference to the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives with a reference to the insurance committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 16; Title 24; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, replaces an obsolete reference to the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives with a reference to the insurance committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 16; Title 24; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0088 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Failed in Health Committee