TN SB1247 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/24/2023, 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/24/2023, 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes revisions to the law relative to reinstating certificates of registration for professional master barbers, barber instructors, and technicians, and licenses of cosmetologists, manicurists, aestheticians, and natural hair stylists. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/24/2023, 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 208 | |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 8, PNV 0 |
2023-04-06 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0268) |
2023-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0031) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1291 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 208