TN SB1235 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to perform a study regarding disparities in the issuance of state contracts to businesses owned and operated by African Americans, and to report its findings no later than January 31, 2022. - Amends amend TCA Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1, relative to state contracts with businesses owned by African Americans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1593 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration