TN HB1593 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to perform a study regarding disparities in the issuance of state contracts to businesses owned and operated by African Americans, and to report its findings no later than January 31, 2022. - Amends amend TCA Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1, relative to state contracts with businesses owned by African Americans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to TACIR |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Finance, Ways, & Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1235 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee