TN SB1223 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires department to post annual report regarding the status of water quality on its website within five business days of the report's submission to the governor and general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 66; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
As introduced, requires department to post annual report regarding the status of water quality on its website within five business days of the report's submission to the governor and general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 66; Title 68 and Title 69.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1378 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee