TN SB1222 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Every Mom Matters Act," which requires a woman to complete a free resource access consultation with the department of health prior to having an abortion. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-504; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the Every Mom Matters Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1425 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback