TN SB1211 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that wireless communication includes text messages sent and received on smart devices for purposes of the Anti-Phishing Act. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to consumer protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 370 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1298 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 370