TN SB1210 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/22/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/22/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits any registered Tennessee voter to vote absentee for any reason after providing evidence of identification in the application for a ballot; exempts certain absentee voters from the evidence of identification requirement under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, permits any registered Tennessee voter to vote absentee for any reason after providing evidence of identification in the application for a ballot; exempts certain absentee voters from the evidence of identification requirement under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0553 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee