TN SB1194 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from five days to five business days, the amount of notice a local board of education member must give the board before a scheduled meeting of the member's intent to participate in the meeting electronically because the member is or will be out of the county at the time of the meeting. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1214 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration