TN SB1181 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the release eligibility for persons sentenced to life imprisonment for first degree murder; requires the department of correction to notify inmates previously sentenced to life imprisonment of eligibility for earlier release upon filing a written request. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Section 40-35-501.
Title
As introduced, revises the release eligibility for persons sentenced to life imprisonment for first degree murder; requires the department of correction to notify inmates previously sentenced to life imprisonment of eligibility for earlier release upon filing a written request. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Section 40-35-501.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1128 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1181&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB1181.pdf |