TN SB1179 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, replaces incorrect code references, including a reference to the tax on annuity receipts for excise tax purposes, and a reference to the definition of "medical equipment" for purposes of a certain franchise/excise tax credit, among other provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, replaces incorrect code references, including a reference to the tax on annuity receipts for excise tax purposes, and a reference to the definition of "medical equipment" for purposes of a certain franchise/excise tax credit, among other provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend, as amended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0977 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1179&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1179.pdf |