TN SB1178 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes issuance of colon cancer awareness new specialty earmarked license plates; earmarks 50 percent of funds produced from sale thereof to promote public education and awareness about colon cancer. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes issuance of colon cancer awareness new specialty earmarked license plates; earmarks 50 percent of funds produced from sale thereof to promote public education and awareness about colon cancer. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-26 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2009-03-23 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2009-03-23 Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2009-03-20 Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (3) cal. for 03/23/2009
2009-03-18 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2009-03-12 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/18/2009
2009-03-03 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. F,W&M Comm.
2009-02-25 Placed on Senate Transportation Consent cal. for 03/03/2009
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-12 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1179 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-07 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Special License Plate calendar

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback