TN SB1153 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Historic Rehabilitation Tax Credit Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 4 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Historic Rehabilitation Tax Credit Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 4 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means to next calendar |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1237 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1153&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1153.pdf |