TN SB1149 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2019-2020 fiscal year, the number of instructional positions funded under the BEP to reflect the number of teachers a school district is required to employ to comply with maximum class size requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2019-2020 fiscal year, the number of instructional positions funded under the BEP to reflect the number of teachers a school district is required to employ to comply with maximum class size requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0255 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee