TN SB1144 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a 16-auditorium movie theater in Davidson County to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises if the theater has one auditorium restricted to patrons 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, allows a 16-auditorium movie theater in Davidson County to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises if the theater has one auditorium restricted to patrons 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1589 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1144&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1144.pdf |