TN SB1141 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows special education teachers and alternative school teachers who teach in more than one subject area in which there is an end of course examination until July 1, 2014, to pass the content area tests in the subject areas in which they are teaching. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-6006.
Title
As introduced, allows special education teachers and alternative school teachers who teach in more than one subject area in which there is an end of course examination until July 1, 2014, to pass the content area tests in the subject areas in which they are teaching. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-6006.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0249 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1141&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1141.pdf |