TN SB1140 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from 45 to 30 days from the date of decedent's death the time period after which a small estate affidavit may be filed with the clerk of court. - Amends TCA Title 30.
Title
As introduced, changes from 45 to 30 days from the date of decedent's death the time period after which a small estate affidavit may be filed with the clerk of court. - Amends TCA Title 30.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1123 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1140&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB1140.pdf |