TN SB1128 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the executive director of the board of nursing to report concerning workforce needs for nurses in healthcare institutions and facilities in this state and the need for any beneficial changes to the educational training of nurses in order to meet those needs to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate on or before January 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the executive director of the board of nursing to report concerning workforce needs for nurses in healthcare institutions and facilities in this state and the need for any beneficial changes to the educational training of nurses in order to meet those needs to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate on or before January 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
2019-04-22SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1350 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 326

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback