TN HB1350 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the executive director of the board of nursing to report concerning workforce needs for nurses in healthcare institutions and facilities in this state and the need for any beneficial changes to the educational training of nurses in order to meet those needs to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate on or before January 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the executive director of the board of nursing to report concerning workforce needs for nurses in healthcare institutions and facilities in this state and the need for any beneficial changes to the educational training of nurses in order to meet those needs to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate on or before January 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 326
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019; 07/01/2020
2019-05-08 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-29HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-22SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0306)
2019-04-22SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 1
2019-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0306)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1128 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback