TN SB1123 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to second calendar of 2020
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from December 31 to December 15 the annual date by which the departments of health and human services must jointly provide to the appropriate committees of the senate and the house of representatives a written list of available state and federal options under medicaid and temporary assistance for needy families. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 43; Title 44; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes from December 31 to December 15 the annual date by which the departments of health and human services must jointly provide to the appropriate committees of the senate and the house of representatives a written list of available state and federal options under medicaid and temporary assistance for needy families. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 43; Title 44; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to second calendar of 2020
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1129 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Def. to First Calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback