TN SB1117 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds to transit authority management boards a non-voting member recommended by the labor organization representing the plurality of employees and allows the chairperson to exclude the member from meetings on negotiations with labor organizations. - Amends TCA Section 7-56-101.
Title
As introduced, adds to transit authority management boards a non-voting member recommended by the labor organization representing the plurality of employees and allows the chairperson to exclude the member from meetings on negotiations with labor organizations. - Amends TCA Section 7-56-101.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1529 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1117&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1117.pdf |