TN SB1115 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes the statute of limitation for prosecution of trafficking for commercial sex act when committed against a child on or after July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to statutes of limitation for human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 363
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-26HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-26HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-11HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-08SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021
2021-03-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1302 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback