TN HB1302 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the statute of limitation for prosecution of trafficking for commercial sex act when committed against a child on or after July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to statutes of limitation for human trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363 | |
2021-04-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1115 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021