TN SB1093 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes killing of another while committing domestic abuse first degree murder if there was past pattern of abuse upon victim and circumstances of death manifested extreme indifference to life. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, makes killing of another while committing domestic abuse first degree murder if there was past pattern of abuse upon victim and circumstances of death manifested extreme indifference to life. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0525 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1093&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1093.pdf |