TN SB1091 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/19/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/19/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds additional requirements to be submitted for certain candidates' names to be placed on the ballot in this state. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, adds additional requirements to be submitted for certain candidates' names to be placed on the ballot in this state. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1784 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1091&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1091.pdf |