TN SB1085 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a housing authority-related entity participating in a mixed-finance project to form a self-insurance pooling arrangement, if the housing authority with which the entity is related has formed partnerships, limited liability companies, or other entities in which an authority, or an entity affiliated with the authority, is a general partner, managing member, or otherwise participates in the activities of the entity. - Amends TCA Section 13-20-104 and Title 29, Chapter 20.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 13-20-104 and Title 29, Chapter 20, relative to housing authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 394 | |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0879 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023