TN SB1073 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to hold public hearings on Monday through Thursday outside of normal business hours, or at any time on Saturday. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 44; Title 11; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to hold public hearings on Monday through Thursday outside of normal business hours, or at any time on Saturday. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 44; Title 11; Title 68 and Title 69.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0593 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee