TN SB1049 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov. Ops. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov. Ops. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement that council for licensing hearing instrument specialists be administratively attached to board of communication disorders and sciences; renames council the board for licensing hearing instrument specialists. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement that council for licensing hearing instrument specialists be administratively attached to board of communication disorders and sciences; renames council the board for licensing hearing instrument specialists. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov. Ops. Com. | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. - for review | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1271 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1049&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1049.pdf |