TN SB1046 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires LEAs to provide free feminine hygiene products in eligible public high schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires LEAs to provide free feminine hygiene products in eligible public high schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1483 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback