TN SB1027 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Interstate Compact for License Portability Act" for professional counseling services. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 63, relative to licensure of professional counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/27/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1088 | |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0493) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/28/2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0493) |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0490) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0126) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0959 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1088